MD HB1130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting persons other than individuals or campaign finance entities from directly or indirectly making contributions to campaign finance entities.
Title
Election Law – Campaign Contributions – Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] | Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Gabriel Acevero [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |