MD HB1136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying 9 a.m. to 9 p.m. as the hours of sale for a holder of a Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license in a specified area of Baltimore City; prohibiting the hours of sale for a license holder in a specified area from beginning before or ending after specified times; and prohibiting the hours of sale from being extended under specified conditions.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {533325/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Blue Laws
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Blue Laws
Retail Sales