MD HB1136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to review certain reports and, in counties where fewer than 50% of students who have failed hearing and vision screenings are receiving the recommended services, to coordinate with the county board or the county health department to implement measures to improve the number of students receiving the recommended services.
Title
Student Hearing and Vision Screenings – Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Angela Angel [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] |
Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] | Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {645462/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Health
Health, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Records
Reports
Students
Health
Health, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Records
Reports
Students