MD HB1140 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services from planning or constructing the New Youth Detention Facility in Baltimore City; prohibiting the planning or construction of a detention facility for juveniles in Baltimore City until there are adequate structures in place and adequate funding dedicated to meet the educational, recreational, and social services needs of juvenile residents of Baltimore City; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Juvenile Detention Facilities - Moratorium
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Budgets
Construction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Social Services
Youth
Budgets
Construction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Social Services
Youth
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1140.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1140f.pdf |