MD HB1142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing, beginning after December 31, 2013, but before January 1, 2019, the State income tax rate on the Maryland taxable income of corporations that incorporate in or relocate to the State on or after January 1, 2014.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |