MD HB1142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, during a school redistricting process in which the redistricting plan proposed by the Howard County Board of Education differs from the redistricting plan proposed by the Howard County Superintendent of Schools, that the county board allow one or more members of a household whose school assignment is changed only in the county board's plan to provide public testimony before the final vote on either school redistricting plan.
Title
Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Administrators
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Primary and Secondary Education
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Testimony
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Primary and Secondary Education
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Testimony