MD HB116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Applying certain laws regarding labor relations and collective bargaining to the Board of Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery and employees of the Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery; establishing a bargaining unit for certain employees of the Art Gallery; requiring the Labor Commissioner of Baltimore City to certify an employee organization as the exclusive representative of the bargaining unit under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-35) |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2022-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Baltimore City
Collective Bargaining
Counties - Local Laws
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Museums
Petitions
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Collective Bargaining
Counties - Local Laws
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Museums
Petitions
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Baltimore City | 28 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 28 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 28 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |