MD HB1160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Calvert County to enter into a contract for a cellular tower lease, including a cellular tower lease on a water tower, if the initial term of the lease is not more than 20 years.
Title
Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Calvert County
Equipment
Leases and Rent
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Utility Regulation
Equipment
Leases and Rent
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Calvert County | 6 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |