MD HB1167 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the amount of a credit allowed against the State income tax is 75%, not to exceed $500,000, of the investment in qualified Maryland biotechnology companies located in Allegany, Dorchester, Garrett, or Somerset counties; applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016; etc.
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-4) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-4) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senators Madaleno, Edwards, and Ferguson |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-11 | House | Delegates M. Washington, Fennell, and Long |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2016-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {779834/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Allegany County
Baltimore City
Dorchester County
Garrett County
Industry and Technology
Investments
Somerset County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Baltimore City
Dorchester County
Garrett County
Industry and Technology
Investments
Somerset County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income