MD HB1172 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB746
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting absentee ballot envelopes, ballot/return envelopes, return envelopes, and envelope templates from including language or information that visibly identifies the party affiliation of the voter.
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB746 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
SB989 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-20 - First Reading Senate Rules
SB989 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-20 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 9 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1172?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1172f.pdf |