MD HB1179 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified hybrid vehicles to use a specified high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane regardless of the number of passengers under specified circumstances; making specified requirements regarding the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles applicable to qualified hybrid vehicles; extending the termination date for the exemption allowing the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles; terminating specified provisions in the Act; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640011/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Fees
Highways
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road