MD HB118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making a certain applicant eligible for senatorial and delegate scholarships if the applicant is eligible for in-State tuition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-49) (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Ferguson) Adopted (34-9) (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-50) (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {863121/2 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (40-89) (Y: 41 N: 90 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (87-49)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {213127/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn
2019-04-05SenateMotion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Ferguson) Adopted (34-9)
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {953722/3 (Senator Simonaire)
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {964537/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {964537/1
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (91-50)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFloor Amendment {863121/2 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (40-89)
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {294269/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0118&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0118f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0118t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0118e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_581_hb0118e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_29426901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_86312102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_96453701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_21312701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0118_95372203.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0118.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0118_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0115.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0143.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0118_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1224.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1278.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1522.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback