MD HB1194 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Mount Vernon Place Conservancy, Inc. for the repair, renovation, and reconstruction of the Washington Monument and historic masonry in Mount Vernon Place, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Mount Vernon Place Conservancy,
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1194.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1194f.pdf |