MD HB1194 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-31 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-31 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Board of Plumbing from renewing specified apprentice plumber licenses or apprentice natural gas fitters licenses for more than three consecutive terms if the licensee has not taken or registered to take a journey plumber examination or journeyman gas fitters examination; establishing an exception; etc.
Title
Business Occupations - Plumbers and Gas Fitters - Apprentice License Renewal
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Veronica Turner [D] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] |
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (94-42) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 743598/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |