MD HB1198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a clerk of the court to prominently post the National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline information sign in public information areas of each courthouse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking – Required Posting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {548972/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {482519/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1198&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1198f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1198t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1198e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_373_hb1198e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1198_48251901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1198_54897201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1198.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1198_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0709.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1198_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1321.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1526.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback