MD HB1200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that any funds remaining in a special taxing district established in Calvert County at the termination of the special taxing district may be applied to future special taxing districts, returned to owners of property in the special taxing district in a specified manner, or applied to a reserve fund under specified circumstances.
Title
Calvert County - Special Taxing Districts
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Calvert County
County Commissioners
Homeowners Associations
Property Tax
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits
County Commissioners
Homeowners Associations
Property Tax
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits