MD HB1200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a homeowner to have a homestead property tax credit application on file with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation in order to be eligible for a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax to offset certain increases in local income tax revenues; providing that any increase in county property tax revenue that results from the Act may not be counted toward a certain county limitation on county property tax revenue; applying the Act to taxable years after June 30, 2022; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-5) |
2020-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {445763/1 Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties
Income Tax
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Counties
Income Tax
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |