MD HB1204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-18 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-18 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of a specified performance bond; requiring specified owners of a specified gas interest in specified areas of the State to file a notice with the Department of the Environment in accordance with specified requirements; requiring specified owners of a specified gas interest in specified areas of the State to pay to the Department a specified amount of money on or before specified dates under specified circumstances; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
The Marcellus Shale Safe Drilling Study Fee and Performance Bond Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (88-49) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) 613127/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 490311/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Allegany County
Bonds
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of
Fees
Fuel
Garrett County
Insurance
Liability
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Mining
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Real Property
Reclamation
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sand, Gravel, Stone
Wells
Bonds
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of
Fees
Fuel
Garrett County
Insurance
Liability
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Mining
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Real Property
Reclamation
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sand, Gravel, Stone
Wells