MD HB1209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a unit of State government to allow a resident bidder or resident offeror to resubmit the bid or offer, under specified circumstances, to match the lowest bid or offer, as specified; etc.
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Businesses Located in the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-21 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-21 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1209.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1209f.pdf |