MD HB1211 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a person who feloniously and intentionally kills, conspires to kill, or procures the killing of the decedent is disqualified from inheriting, taking, enjoying, receiving, or otherwise benefiting from the death, probate estate, or nonprobate property of the decedent, or from receiving a general or special power of appointment conferred by the will or trust of the decedent, or from serving as a personal representative, guardian, or trustee of a trust created by the decedent; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {172118/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Civil Actions
Courts
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Financial Institutions
Guardians
Homicide
Insurance
Judgments
Liability
Manslaughter
Murder
Notices
Restitution
Statutes of Limitation
Trials
Civil Actions
Courts
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Financial Institutions
Guardians
Homicide
Insurance
Judgments
Liability
Manslaughter
Murder
Notices
Restitution
Statutes of Limitation
Trials