MD HB1211 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a health care provider, under specified circumstances, from writing a prescription for an opiod for more than a 7-day supply; and requiring a health care provider who is prescribing an opioid to a minor to discuss specified information with the minor and, under specified circumstances, the minor's custodial parent or legal guardian.
Title
Health Care Providers - Opioid Prescriptions - Limitations and Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |