MD HB1212 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a new position with the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission be subject to prior approval of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County; authorizing the Commission to appoint, discharge at pleasure, and fix the compensation of a General Counsel; prohibiting the Director from serving concurrently as the Director and as General Counsel to the Commission; requiring the Commission to adopt or approve, with prior approval of the County Commissioners, plans and a capital budget; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-18 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions
County Commissioners
Sewage
St. Mary's County
Water
Zoning and Planning
Committees and Commissions
County Commissioners
Sewage
St. Mary's County
Water
Zoning and Planning