MD HB1216 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose and contents of and the requirements and qualifications under the Urban Agriculture Grant Fund; requiring nonprofit organizations that receive a grant for purposes of distribution to urban agricultural producers to distribute at least 85% of the grant amount to producers located in low-income census tracts or designated food deserts, of which at least 25% of the grant money is to be distributed to urban agricultural producers in Baltimore City; etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223622/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1216 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Education
Food
Grants
Higher Education
Minorities
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Poverty
Prince George's County
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Urban Areas
Agriculture, Department of
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Education
Food
Grants
Higher Education
Minorities
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Poverty
Prince George's County
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |