MD HB1218 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to administer the Clean Energy Workforce Account; requiring the Department to award grants from the Account in accordance with certain provisions of law; requiring the Department to develop certain application guidelines; and requiring the Department, in developing the application guidelines, to provide opportunity for certain individuals to review and comment on the guidelines and incorporate certain comments into the guidelines.
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB785 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Subjects
Apprentices
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 708.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1218?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1218f.pdf |