MD HB1222 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Senators Gladden, Raskin, and Mooney
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Senators Gladden, Raskin, and Mooney
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Parole and Probation to recommend to the Parole Commission that a specified supervisee be exempt wholly or partly from a specified fee; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Parole and Probation - Supervision Fee
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Gerron Levi [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | Senators Gladden, Raskin, and Mooney | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-07 | Delegates Waldstreicher, Rosenberg, and McConkey | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-07 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-07 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (128-12) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of