MD HB1223 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-02 - Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-02 - Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit union to make member business loans in a total amount equal to an amount approved by a specified federal board in a specified manner.
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Member Business Loans
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Herman Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-02 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-02 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-03-29 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Economic Matters |