MD HB1228 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695965/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Militia
Rescue Squads
Taxes - Income
Volunteers
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Militia
Rescue Squads
Taxes - Income
Volunteers