MD HB1237 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified applicants for police officer certification to submit to specified criminal history records checks; requiring specified applicants for correctional officer certification or certification as a specified Department of Juvenile Services employee to submit to specified criminal history records checks; requiring specified applicants to submit specified fingerprints and fees to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; etc.
Title
Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {202713/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Criminal Background Investigations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Police Training Commission
Privacy
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Correctional Officers
Criminal Background Investigations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Police Training Commission
Privacy
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records