MD HB1241 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using certain polyvinyl chloride or chlorinated polyvinyl chloride piping in the installation, repair, or replacement of a water pipe or plumbing intended to dispense water for human consumption beginning January 1, 2025; and establishing the Water Pipe Safety Workgroup.
Title
Environment - Polyvinyl Chloride and Chlorinated Polyvinyl Water Piping - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Building Maintenance and Repair
Business Occupations and Professions
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Plastics
Plumbing
Public Works
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment
Business Occupations and Professions
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Plastics
Plumbing
Public Works
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |