MD HB1242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to jointly study and assess the number of students identified by vision screenings who need and receive services, the no- or low-cost eye exam or eyeglasses programs that are available, and whether parents are aware of the no- or low-cost eye exams and eyeglass programs; and requiring the departments to jointly report on vision screening matters to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Students – Vision Services – Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {345261/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback