MD HB1242 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to adopt certain regulations related to lead telecommunications cables; and requiring a company that applied for a grant through the federal Broadband Equity, Access, and Deployment (BEAD) Program to submit a certain report to the Department of the Environment, the Office of Statewide Broadband in the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2024.
Title
Public Utilities - Lead Telecommunications Cables - Regulations and Report
Sponsors
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Boundaries
Chemical Tests
Economic Development
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
internet
Public Works
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Chemical Tests
Economic Development
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
internet
Public Works
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 5 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |