MD HB1249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Aviation Administration to conduct a study on increasing commercial air travel at the Martin State Airport; and requiring the Administration to report its finding and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2025.
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Martin State Airport - Study on Commercial Air Travel
Sponsors
Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R] | Del. Nino Mangione [R] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. April Fleming Miller [R] | Del. Stuart Schmidt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-16 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aircraft
Airports
Commerce and Business
Reports
studies
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Aircraft
Airports
Commerce and Business
Reports
studies
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally