MD HB1253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Stating the findings and intent of the General Assembly that any exposure to lead in drinking water is dangerous to children, that schools should be proactive in reducing lead in drinking water outlets to 5 parts per billion, and that State and federal funds should be made available to schools for that purpose; specifying that the Interagency Commission on School Construction is required to give priority in awarding grants from the Healthy School Facility Fund to schools where lead is found to be present in drinking water; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings – Lead Testing and Reporting Requirements and Grant Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Young) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {454436/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {860416/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1253&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1253f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1253t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1253e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_557_hb1253e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1253_86041601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1253_45443601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1253.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1253_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0711.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1253_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1613.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1425.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback