MD HB126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB165
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1013
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1013
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the standard time in the State to be Eastern Daylight Time year-round.
Title
General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-24) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-09-10 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB126 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1013 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1013 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |