MD HB1263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office on Climate Change in the Office of the Governor to coordinate with the Commission on Climate Change to ensure certain recommendations are implemented, ensure that each State agency addresses ways the agency can mitigate the causes of climate change and certain impacts of climate change, initiate and oversee certain climate change research and investigations, and work with local governments on the development and implementation of local climate change plans.
Title
Environment – Office on Climate Change – Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] |
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Jared Solomon [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB503 (Carry Over) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environmental Health
Governor
Investigations and Inquiries
Pollution
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environmental Health
Governor
Investigations and Inquiries
Pollution
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2-13A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2-13A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2-13A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 2-13A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |