MD HB1296 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the St. Mary's County Alcohol Beverage Board to issue a special Class M-G beer, wine and liquor license for use at a specified golf course; specifying that a licensee may be a golf course manager; providing for an annual license fee; specifying that the license may be used to sell beer, wine, and liquor for consumption only on the land and in the facilities used for golfing purposes; authorizing a golf course manager to designate an agent for specified purposes; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course License
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-05 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-05 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-27 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/26 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
St. Mary's County
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
St. Mary's County