MD HB1296 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Physicians to issue a cease and desist order or obtain injunctive relief against an individual for taking any action for which the Board determines there is a preponderance of evidence of grounds for discipline under a specified provision of law and that poses a serious risk to the health, safety, and welfare of a patient; repealing the authority for specified persons to appeal specified decisions to the Board of Review, followed by a specified appeal; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {484734/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {356680/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Evidence
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Judicial Review
Medical Malpractice
Patients
Physicians
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Evidence
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Judicial Review
Medical Malpractice
Patients
Physicians
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Safety