MD HB1297 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to request a security freeze on the consumer report or a specified record of specified protected consumers who are minor children in the custody of a local department of social services who have been placed in a foster care setting in accordance with specified application procedures; requiring a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze for a protected consumer under specified circumstances and within a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Delegates Jameson, Haddaway-Riccio, and Schulz |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senators Klausmeier, Kittleman, and Garagiola |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2013-04-06 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2013-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377777/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243396/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Adoption
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees
Foster Care
Identification
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Privacy
Records
Reports
Social Services
Adoption
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees
Foster Care
Identification
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Privacy
Records
Reports
Social Services