MD HB1310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities to develop certain policies and recommendations to place certain priorities in certain years for directing certain spending on clean energy and energy efficiency programs, projects, or investments to benefit certain low-income communities; providing for the application of certain priorities to certain programs, projects, and investments; requiring the Commission to consult with the Department of the Environment and certain other agencies; etc.
Title
Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Low-Income Communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1310 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Investments
Labor, Department of
Pollution
Poverty
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Investments
Labor, Department of
Pollution
Poverty
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1310?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1310f.pdf |