MD HB1322 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to study and make recommendations about the advisability of conducting specified auctions relating to the right of electric companies and electric cooperatives to provide electric service to customers using standard offer service in specified service territories and the manner in which the auctions should be conducted, including specified items; etc.
Title
Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Standard Offer Service - Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-14 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-03-04 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1322.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1322f.pdf |