MD HB1328 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a unit of State government to be audited by an independent auditor beginning on July 1, 2014, and every 2 fiscal years thereafter; requiring that the audit cover specified fiscal years and that a specified report be submitted to the Department of Budget and Management by a specified date; requiring the Department to contract with a specified auditor for a specified purpose; authorizing a specified auditor to be paid only by a specified method; etc.
Title
State Government - Independent Audits of Units - Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1328.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1328f.pdf |