MD HB1344 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility requirements for recall of a former judge in Baltimore City, Charles County, Harford County, and Prince George's County for temporary assignment; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {562716/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Charles County
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Judges
Prince George's County
Charles County
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Emergency Bills
Harford County
Judges
Prince George's County