MD HB1345 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the credit against the State income tax for the costs of purchasing qualified electric vehicle recharging equipment; establishing, for fiscal years 2015 through 2017, the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program to provide rebates to individuals and entities for the costs of acquiring and installing vehicle recharging equipment; extending the credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for specified qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles for a specified period of time; requiring a report; etc.
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-17) (Y: 119 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-17) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {509537/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-9) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {720313/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Counties
Energy Matters
Equipment
Excise Tax
Income Tax
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Service Stations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Transportation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Counties
Energy Matters
Equipment
Excise Tax
Income Tax
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Service Stations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Transportation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration