MD HB1353 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to implement, subject to available funding in the State budget, a program to use Bacillus thuringiensis israelensis to control or eliminate nuisance insects in the State; requiring the program to be implemented on State-owned property, local government property with consent, and private property with the owner's consent; requiring that a certain notice be provided to certain entities and posted on certain social media sites; establishing the Nuisance Insects Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Nuisance Insects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {563626/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {694530/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1353&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1353f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1353t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1353e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_132_hb1353e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1353_69453001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1353_56362601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1353.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1353_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0744.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1353_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1336.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1164.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback