MD HB1359 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 to extend to June 1, 2014, the date by which the Board of Directors of the Old Blair Auditorium Project, Inc. must present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; providing that the grant may not terminate before June 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School Auditorium
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Historical Matters
Montgomery County
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Theaters
Historical Matters
Montgomery County
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Theaters