MD HB1362 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain limitation applicable to Baltimore City relating to the use of highway user revenues to pay or finance costs incurred for carrying out traffic functions and enforcing traffic laws; and authorizing Kent County to use highway user revenues for costs incurred by its police department for carrying out traffic functions and enforcing the traffic laws.
Title
Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification
Sponsors
Del. Roxane Prettyman [D] | Del. Chanel Branch [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Melissa Wells [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592 |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB729 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Subjects
Baltimore City
Highways
Kent County
Law Enforcement
Revenue and Taxes
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Highways
Kent County
Law Enforcement
Revenue and Taxes
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |