MD HB1365 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a claims examiner from making a determination regarding a claim for unemployment benefits unless sufficient information is provided by the last known employing unit of the claimant so that the claims examiner may resolve whether the claimant is disqualified under a specified provision of law.
Title
Unemployment Benefits Claims - Information Required for Determination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-03-11 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1365.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1365f.pdf |