MD HB1366 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the State budget to the Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education for fiscal years 2021 through 2026 to increase the number of green schools in the State; specifying the purposes for which the funds may be used; requiring that an annual evaluation of the impact of the funds be conducted in a certain manner, examine certain issues, and be provided to certain persons; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant (Maryland Green Schools Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-33) (Y: 98 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-04-01SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (98-33)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {995365/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback