MD HB1401 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $100,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy for the planning, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy, including restoring the track and field and installing a fitness circuit, located in Rockville; prohibiting the use of the loan proceeds or matching fund for sectarian religious purposes; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Restorations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |