MD HB1420 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a fee-for-service payment pilot program; authorizing providers that provide waiver program services to certain eligible individuals with a developmental disability to participate in the pilot program; requiring the Department to determine, establish, and publish certain rates for the waiver program services in a certain manner; requiring certain providers to submit a claim for payment for certain services on a form the Department requires; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {816481/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-13HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback